Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01271
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Altus Global Aviation, LLC
111 Erick St. Ste 127
Crystal Lake, IL 60014
Represented By
Altus Global Aviation, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 8:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1271 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 1:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 12 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 9:48 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/17 5:32 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Serving First Set Of Interrogatories, Expert Witness Interrogatories, First Request For Production, And First Request For Admissions To Defendant , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 02/17 5:17 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 02/17 4:08 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Altus Global Aviation, LLC. (Luna, Laudy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/17 10:27 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Altus Global Aviation, LLC. (Luna, Laudy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
6 6 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:20 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Document List Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Monday, October 17, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 10/17 2:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Laudy Luna Filed by Defendant Altus Global Aviation, LLC. (Luna, Laudy)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/17 10:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:19 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Altus Global Aviation, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01271 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Altus Global Aviation, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:27 AM
Adversary case 22-01271 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Altus Global Aviation, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]