Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01274
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Andre Alexander Gardner
114 5th Di Lido Dr. Terrace
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Represented By
Andre Alexander Gardner
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
42 42 court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/12 8:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1274 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
41 41 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/28 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 40 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/26 8:29 AM
Order of Dismissal [Settlement] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
39 39 misc Report of Mediator Thu 02/29 11:23 AM
Report of Mediator Filed by Mediator Jerry M. Markowitz. (Markowitz, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Filing Wed 02/28 2:49 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
37 37 order Continue Hearing Order Fri 02/09 10:06 PM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion To Continue Final Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines Re: ( 1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 10/03/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
36 36 motion Continue Hearing Wed 02/07 2:24 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(6 Order Extending Discovery Period,32 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing)] Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
35 35 notice Notice of Filing Tue 10/17 9:02 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery (Service Date of 10/13/2023) , Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner. (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Filing Tue 10/17 9:01 AM
Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Response to Discovery , Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner. (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/12 4:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner Related [+]. (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Stipulation,32 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Monday, September 11, 2023
32 32 order Continue Hearing Order Mon 09/11 9:16 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion To Continue Final Petrial Conference and Related Deadlines ( 1 Complaint). Pretrial Conference set for 03/07/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 09, 2023
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/10 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Granting Stipulation For Substitution of Counsel (Re: 28 ) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Friday, September 08, 2023
30 30 motion Continue Hearing Fri 09/08 9:43 AM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
29 29 order Stipulation Order Thu 09/07 8:24 AM
Order Granting Stipulation For Substitution of Counsel Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 28
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
28 28 motion Stipulation Tue 09/05 4:15 PM
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 09/05 1:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Barry Seth Turner Esq. Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner. (Turner, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
26 26 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Tue 08/01 11:28 AM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner. (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
25 25 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 07/31 6:51 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/14 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 23 Order (Generic)
Friday, June 09, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 06/09 12:49 PM
Agreed Scheduling Order Related [+] . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, April 14, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/14 2:04 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint Filed by Andre Alexander Gardner. (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
21 21 order Extend Time Order Tue 04/11 9:17 AM
Agreed Order Granting Third Agreed Motion for Extension ofTime to Respond to Adversary Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and for Unjust Enrichment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 20
Friday, April 07, 2023
20 20 motion Extend Time Fri 04/07 3:14 PM
Third Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/07 9:52 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, April 06, 2023
18 18 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 04/06 12:45 PM
Re-Notice of Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary Complaint.
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/29 9:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner Related [+]. (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time,16 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, March 27, 2023
16 16 order Extend Time Order Mon 03/27 1:46 PM
Agreed Order Granting Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and for Unjust Enrichment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 15
Friday, March 24, 2023
15 15 motion Extend Time Fri 03/24 2:01 PM
Second Agreed Motion to Extend Time to RESPOND TO ADVERSARY COMPLAINT TO AVOID AND RECOVER TRANSFERS AND FOR UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND TO CONTINUE OTHER DEADLINES Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
14 14 order Extend Time Order Wed 03/08 3:13 PM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of time to Respond To Adversary Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and for Unjust Enrichment. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #13
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 motion Extend Time Mon 03/06 9:13 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint Filed by Defendant Andre Alexander Gardner (Traband, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Tue 02/07 3:52 PM
Notice of Filing Return of Service , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01274 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Andre Alexander Gardner. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,8 Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons and Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference. (Re:7 ),9 Alias Summons Issued on Andre Alexander Gardner Answer Due 3/6/2023 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01274 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Andre Alexander Gardner. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.,10 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:9 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued).
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/07 11:47 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,8 Order on Motion to Issue Summons,9 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,10 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, February 03, 2023
10 10 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 1:55 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 9 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
9 9 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 1:54 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Andre Alexander Gardner Answer Due 3/6/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01274 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Andre Alexander Gardner. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
8 8 order Issue Summons Order Fri 02/03 1:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons and Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #7
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
7 7 motion Issue Summons Wed 02/01 5:10 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons & Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:25 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Monday, October 17, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/17 10:30 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:27 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Andre Alexander Gardner Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01274 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Andre Alexander Gardner. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:32 AM
Adversary case 22-01274 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Andre Alexander Gardner. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]