Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01275
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Array Aviation, Inc.
1315 NW 98th Ct. Suite 1
Doral, FL 33172
Represented By
Array Aviation, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 7:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1275 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 3:31 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,12 Default Judgment,13 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. .)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re:13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. .))
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
14 14 court Notice of PDF Document to BNC Fri 02/10 3:44 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. .)
13 13 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 3:40 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. .
12 12 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 3:37 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 3:35 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #10
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/08 4:41 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Array Aviation, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. (Re:7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:15 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
7 7 motion Default Wed 01/25 2:23 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Array Aviation, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:27 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/18 10:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:35 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:33 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Array Aviation, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01275 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Array Aviation, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:37 AM
Adversary case 22-01275 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Array Aviation, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]