Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01276
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:May 15, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MK AVIATION, LLC, Defendant
9471 NW 12TH ST.
DORAL, FL 33172
Represented By
MK AVIATION, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila, Plaintiff
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, May 15, 2023
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/15 9:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1276 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 04/28 3:02 PM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Selection of Mediator Fri 02/03 9:45 AM
Notice of Selection of Roy S Kobert as Mediator Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/21 12:11 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint Filed by MK Aviation, LLC. (Wolland, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:29 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/18 10:58 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:41 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:40 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on MK Aviation, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01276 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MK AVIATION, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:39 AM
Adversary case 22-01276 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MK AVIATION, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]