Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01278
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Avioserv San Diego, Inc.
6495 Marindustry Dr.
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
Avioserv San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
19 19 court Notification of Returned Mail Wed 03/08 11:05 AM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Notice of Entry of Final Default Judgment, ECF #12 for Avioserv San Diego, Inc, POB 867 San Diego, CA 92074) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
18 18 court Notification of Returned Mail Tue 03/07 9:26 AM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Notice of Entry of Final Default Judgment, ECF #12) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 7:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1278 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 3:10 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Default Judgment,12 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego INC.)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment (Re:9 )
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego INC.)
Friday, February 10, 2023
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 1:43 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego INC.
11 11 order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 12:59 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego INC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 12:49 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #9
Thursday, February 09, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/09 11:55 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Avioserv San Diego, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 02/03 11:10 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego, Inc. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, February 02, 2023
7 7 motion Default Thu 02/02 5:04 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Avioserv San Diego, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:34 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/18 11:14 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:57 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:55 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Avioserv San Diego, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01278 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Avioserv San Diego, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:45 AM
Adversary case 22-01278 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Avioserv San Diego, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]