Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01279
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.
6825 SW 21st Ct. Ste 4
Davie, FL 33317
Represented By
Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/21 10:44 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1279 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 02/02 6:04 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Order Fri 01/27 12:16 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #9
Thursday, January 26, 2023
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/26 12:59 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Roland Gary Jones [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/26 1:03 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 22-01279 RAM] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41992971. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/17 10:53 AM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in Mediation , Filed by Defendant Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 01/16 1:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Brian K. McMahon Esq. Filed by Defendant Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:36 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/18 11:26 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:02 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:01 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01279 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 11:58 AM
Adversary case 22-01279 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]