Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01280
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MM AERO CONSULTING, INC., Defendant
14323 Stirrup Lane
Wellington, FL 33414
Represented By
MM AERO CONSULTING, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila, Plaintiff
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, January 30, 2023
8 8 court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/30 7:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1280 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 01/09 3:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 11:38 AM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/18 11:32 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:07 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on MM Aero Consulting, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01280 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MM AERO CONSULTING, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:01 PM
Adversary case 22-01280 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MM AERO CONSULTING, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]