Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01290
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
COMCAST
1701 John F. Kennedy Blvd Ste 1
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
COMCAST
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, September 07, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/07 3:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 10 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/29 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1290 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/29 9:00 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Thu 07/27 4:51 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Selection of Mediator Fri 02/03 10:21 AM
Notice of Selection of Jerry M. Markowitz as Mediator Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/17 4:04 PM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in Mediation Process , Filed by Defendant Comcast. (Schuster, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:44 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 12:03 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 10:44 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:33 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Comcast Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01290 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against COMCAST. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:35 PM
Adversary case 22-01290 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against COMCAST. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]