Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01291
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
COORDINATE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
1209 Orange St.
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
COORDINATE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/16 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Denying Defendant's Motion To Vacate Without Prejudice (Re:18 )
Monday, March 13, 2023
19 19 order Vacate Order Mon 03/13 12:27 PM
Order Denying Defendant's Motion To Vacate Without Prejudice Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #18
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
18 18 motion Vacate Wed 03/08 3:41 PM
Verified Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 12 Default Judgment
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 7:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1291 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 2:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,12 Default Judgment,13 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC .)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
13 13 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 2:09 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC .
12 12 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 1:57 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 1:55 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #10
Thursday, February 09, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/09 3:05 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC (Re:7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:18 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
7 7 motion Default Wed 01/25 2:34 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 12:05 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:36 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Coordinate Equipment Leasing, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01291 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against COORDINATE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:39 PM
Adversary case 22-01291 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against COORDINATE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]