Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01294
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
DEPORTIVA 52, LLC
3109 Grand Ave. #447
Miami, FL 33133
Represented By
DEPORTIVA 52, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 8:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1294 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 9:57 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
10 10 misc Document Tue 01/17 12:35 PM
Notice of Election to Participate in Mediation Process Filed by Defendant Deportiva 52, LLC Related [+]. (Rich, Brian)
Related: [-] 7 Order Extending Discovery Period
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 10/26 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Samuel J Capuano Filed by Defendant Deportiva 52, LLC. (Capuano, Samuel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 10/26 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Brian G Rich Filed by Defendant Deportiva 52, LLC. (Rich, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 10/20 11:26 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Selected Event Does Not Match PDF Image. IN THE FUTURE, THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT ADVERSARY - OTHER EVENT: SUMMONS SERVICE EXECUTED. Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
5 5 misc Amended Document Wed 10/19 12:10 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Documents Listed Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 10/19 10:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:49 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:48 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Deportiva 52, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01294 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against DEPORTIVA 52, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:48 PM
Adversary case 22-01294 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against DEPORTIVA 52, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]