Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01295
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Novo Aero Services LLC, Defendant
6965 Vista Parkway North Unit 16/17
West Palm Beach,, FL 33411
Represented By
Novo Aero Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila, Plaintiff
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 8:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1295 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 2:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 16 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, June 29, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/29 10:44 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
15 15 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 03/08 12:38 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nathan G Mancuso Related [+]. (Mancuso, Nathan)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Vacate
14 14 order Vacate Order Wed 03/08 11:12 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant Novo Aero Services LLC -. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default #11
Monday, February 06, 2023
13 13 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 02/06 10:36 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nathan G Mancuso Related [+]. (Mancuso, Nathan)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Hearing
12 12 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Mon 02/06 7:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Vacate (Re:7 Clerk's Entry of Default) Filed by Defendant Novo Aero Services LLC.
Sunday, February 05, 2023
11 11 motion Vacate Sun 02/05 2:07 PM
Motion to Vacate Related [+] Filed by Defendant Novo Aero Services LLC (Mancuso, Nathan)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 02/05 2:02 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Novo Aero Services LLC. (Mancuso, Nathan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Sun 02/05 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Nathan G Mancuso Filed by Defendant Novo Aero Services LLC. (Mancuso, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Novo Aero Service, LLC (Re:6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Novo Aero Service, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:20 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Novo Aero Service, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Novo Aero Service, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
6 6 motion Default Wed 01/25 3:06 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Novo Aero Service, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
5 5 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 10:52 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:45 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Novo Aero Services LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01295 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Novo Aero Services LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 12:50 PM
Adversary case 22-01295 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Novo Aero Services LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]