Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10165

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:22-ap-01151
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Klaynberg
114 Mulberry Street Apt. 703
New York, NY 10013
Represented By
Joseph Klaynberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee, for the Benefit of the Registered Holders of BANK 2020-BNK29, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2020-BNK29 by and through Rialto Capital Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Special
Represented By
Brent W. Procida
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 27, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/27 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1151 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
23 23 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 10/17 10:46 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
22 22 misc Transcript Wed 09/27 3:15 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/21/2023 at 10:00 AM RE: Pretrial Conference Using Zoom for Government. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/26/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/3/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/27/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/26/2023. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-] 16 ,18 ,21 ,19 ,5 ,6 ,9 ,2 ,3 ,1 ,10 ,15 ,8 ,12 ,20 ,13
Monday, August 07, 2023
21 21 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 08/07 2:47 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference to August 21, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. with hearing to be held on 8/21/2023 at Videoconference (ZoomGov). (Pollack, Bonnie) Modified hearing location on 8/8/2023 (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
20 20 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/20 7:29 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. with hearing to be held on 8/8/2023 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
19 19 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 06/05 2:10 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. with hearing to be held on 8/8/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
18 18 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 06/05 1:26 PM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 6/5/2023, Extending Time of Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move Through and Including July 28, 2023. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 06/05 11:37 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
16 16 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 04/12 4:58 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. with hearing to be held on 6/6/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
15 15 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 03/27 3:27 PM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 3/27/2023, Extending Time of Defendant to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Move Through and Including May 26, 2023. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 03/27 11:18 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to May 26, 2023 Filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
13 13 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 01/30 4:09 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. with hearing to be held on 4/17/2023 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
12 12 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 01/27 11:07 AM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 1/27/2023, Extending Time of Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move Through and including March 27, 2023. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 01/27 10:11 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Related [+] Filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, January 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 01/19 9:53 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. with hearing to be held on 2/8/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 01/04 3:39 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing - Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
8 8 order So Ordered Stipulation Wed 12/21 3:20 PM
Stipulation and Order, Signed on 12/21/2022, Extending Time of Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move Through and Including January 27, 2023. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 12/21 11:27 AM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Move With Respect to Complaint Filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 10/19 11:57 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
5 5 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 10/06 2:54 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/6/2022 Extending Time of Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move through and including December 27, 2022. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 10/06 1:40 PM
Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Move Filed by Bonnie Lynn Pollack on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Pollack, Bonnie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 09/29 11:17 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 09/27 3:20 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 10/27/2022, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 09/27 12:25 PM
Adversary case 22-01151 Complaint against Joseph Klaynberg / Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(2)(B) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Filed by Brent W. Procida on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee. (Procida, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Adversary Cover Sheet