New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:22-bk-10165
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 24, 2023

Debtor
Joseph Klaynberg
8 East 48th Street Apt. 4C
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Roman V Gambourg
Gambourg Law Group
contact info
Matthew G. Roseman
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Jonathan L. Flaxer
Golenbock, Eiseman, Assor, Bell
contact info
Bonnie Lynn Pollack
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Michael Scott Weinstein
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell &peskoe LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 22, 2025 3:26 PM EDT
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee
Represented By
Brent W. Procida
Venable LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bank Leumi USA
Represented By
Veronique Urban
contact info
Creditor
Valley National Bank, as the successor by merger to Bank Leumi USA
Represented By
Veronique Urban
contact info
Martin G Bunin
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Citizens Bank, N.A.
Attn: Kevin Tompsett, Esq. 99 Garnsey Road
Pittsford, NY 14534
Represented By
Kevin Tompsett
Harris Beach Murtha Cullina PLLC
contact info
Melissa Sue DiCerbo
Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway
contact info
Creditor
Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Rich
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Creditor
Investors Bank
225 Gordons Corner Rd. Suite 1J
Manalapan, NJ 07726
Represented By
Alan R. Ostrowitz
Ostrowitz & Ostrowitz, Esq.
contact info
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By
Phillip Andrew Raymond
Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLC
contact info
Creditor
People's United Bank, National Association
Represented By
Scott D. Rosen
Cohn Birnbaum & Shea P.C.
contact info
Creditor
NYS Department of Taxation & Finance
15 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201
Represented By
Jeffrey K. Cymbler
Ny State Department Taxation & Finance
contact info
Creditor
Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
One M&T Plaza
Buffalo, NY 14203
Represented By
Stephan E. Hornung
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Robert Klaynberg
Represented By
Avrum J. Rosen
Law Offices Of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC
contact info
Nico Pizzo
Rosen, Tsionis & Pizzo, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Rialto Capital Advisors LLC, as Special Servicer
Represented By
Brent W. Procida
Venable LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lehman Flynn Vollaro NY CPAs PLLC
1425 RXR Plaza, 15th FL
Uniondale, NY 11556
Represented By
Sheryl P Giugliano
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Emily Klaynberg
Represented By
Lauren Catherine Kiss
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
Fred Stevens
Klestadt Winters Jureller
contact info
Interested Party
Edward Klaynberg
Represented By
Avrum J. Rosen
Law Offices Of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC
contact info
Nico Pizzo
Rosen, Tsionis & Pizzo, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Daniel Klaynberg
Represented By
Avrum J. Rosen
Law Offices Of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC
contact info
Nico Pizzo
Rosen, Tsionis & Pizzo, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
EMG Transfer Agent LLC
Zucker & Sharfstein, LLP 1201 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556
Represented By
William Heuer
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker & Sharfstein, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Eric Brody
Represented By
Marc A. Pergament
Weinberg, Gross, & Pergament, LLP
contact info
Trustee
Jonathan L. Flaxer, Chapter 11 Trustee
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe LL 711 Third Ave
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jonathan L. Flaxer
Golenbock, Eiseman, Assor, Bell
contact info
Courtney Iverson Howard
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe LLP
contact info
Michael Scott Weinstein
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell &peskoe LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Tara Tiantian
Doj-Ust
contact info
Unknown
Spectra 101, LLC
755 Main Street, 14th Flr
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Unknown
Spectra 111, LLC
755 Main Street, 14th Flr
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Unknown
Spectra TOP, LLC
755 Main Street, 14th Floor
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info
Unknown
5CP, LLC
755 Main Street, 14th Flr
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric Henzy
Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.
contact info

GPO Sep 19 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 9/19/2022, Granting Motion for Leave to File Complaint Objecting to Dischargeability of Claim No. 15-1. (related document(s)192) (Anderson, Deanna)
GPO Sep 19 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 9/19/2022, Granting Series 2020A Nahla Capital LLC's Motion for the Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee. (related document(s)189, 214) (Anderson, Deanna)
GPO Aug 22 2023
Memorandum Opinion, Signed on 8/22/2023, Confirming Chapter 11 Trustee's First Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation for Joseph Klaynberg. (related document(s)352, 351, 353) (Anderson, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
477 477 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 05/16 1:34 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 476
476 476 motion Motion, Allow Claims Fri 05/16 10:25 AM
Motion to Allow Claims /Second Renewed Application of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 503(b)(3)(D) and 503(b)(4) for Allowance and Payment of Counsel Fees and Expenses Incurred in Making a Substantial Contribution in the Chapter 11 Case filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC Responses due by 6/2/2025,. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Rich Declaration
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Att: 3 Notice