Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01306
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, October 06, 2023
39 39 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/06 12:52 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1306 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/21 8:02 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 37 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
37 37 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/19 10:19 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Tue 09/12 1:50 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
35 35 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/11 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 34 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, August 10, 2023
34 34 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 08/10 11:45 AM
Re-Notice of Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 09/07/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary Complaint.
Friday, July 07, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/07 3:31 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Serving Interrogatories, Requests For Production And Requests For Admission Of Facts To Defendant , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 07/07 2:51 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/15 4:04 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and for Unjust Enrichment filed by Plaintiff, Soneet Kapila, Trustee Filed by EMC3 Consulting, Inc.. (Hayes, Monique)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/01 1:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 29 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
29 29 8 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Wed 05/31 1:11 PM
Amended Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 08/10/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. **Amended to Change Scheduling Conference Hearing Date. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, May 26, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Fri 05/26 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Monique D Hayes Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.. (Hayes, Monique)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/24 3:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 26 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
Monday, May 22, 2023
26 26 8 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Mon 05/22 3:54 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 08/03/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, May 18, 2023
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/18 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 24 Order (Generic)
Monday, May 15, 2023
24 24 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 05/15 12:00 PM
Order On Status Conference. The Court will enter a separate Order setting a scheduling conference and establishing procedures and deadlines. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
23 23 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 04/25 10:04 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian K. McMahon Esq. Related [+]. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Sunday, April 23, 2023
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Cancelling Mediation and Setting Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 05/11/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Saturday, April 22, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/23 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Roland Gary Jones and Brian K. McMahon as Counsels for EMC3 Consulting Inc. (The Defendant shall have 30 days to obtain new counsel) (Re: 16 ). (Antillon, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/21/2023 to update defendants address and add verbiage .
Friday, April 21, 2023
20 20 4 pgs order Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference Fri 04/21 2:32 PM
Order Cancelling Mediation and Setting Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 05/11/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
19 19 order Withdraw As Attorney Order Thu 04/20 4:39 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Roland Gary Jones and Brian K. McMahon as Counsels for EMC3 Consulting Inc. (The Defendant shall have 30 days to obtain new counsel) Related [+]. (Antillon, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/21/2023 to update defendants address and add verbiage (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, April 17, 2023
18 18 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 04/17 11:51 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian K. McMahon Esq. Related [+]. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.,17 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
17 17 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 04/05 2:41 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Re:14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/05 2:23 PM
Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 04/04 12:48 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian K. McMahon Esq. Related [+]. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
Monday, April 03, 2023
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/03 11:42 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Mon 01/16 11:47 AM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in Mediation , Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
12 12 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 01/11 5:33 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] Withdrawn per DE # 11. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
11 11 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Wed 01/11 1:19 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. Related [+]. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
10 10 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 01/04 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian K. McMahon Esq. Related [+]. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.,9 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, December 29, 2022
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 12/29 8:38 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/28 4:06 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Order Wed 11/09 12:05 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #6
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 11/08 2:27 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Roland Gary Jones [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant EMC3 Consulting, Inc. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11/08 2:29 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 22-01306 RAM] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41667117. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
5 5 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 1:58 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:55 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on EMC3 Consulting, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01306 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against EMC3 Consulting, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 to Edit All Caps Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 2:06 PM
Adversary case 22-01306 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against EMC3 CONSULTING, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]