Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01309
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:May 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Far East Aviation Group, LLC
Represented By
Far East Aviation Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/31 7:42 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1309 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/16 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 14 Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Far East Aviation Group, LLC filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,16 Judgment,17 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, May 14, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Entry (Re:16 Final Default Judgment in Favor of Soneet R. Kapila Against Far East Aviation Group LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) )
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Entry (Re:16 Final Default Judgment in Favor of Soneet R. Kapila Against Far East Aviation Group LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) )
Friday, May 12, 2023
17 17 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 05/12 11:46 AM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 16 Final Default Judgment in Favor of Soneet R. Kapila Against Far East Aviation Group LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
16 16 2 pgs order Judgment Fri 05/12 11:44 AM
Final Default Judgment in Favor of Soneet R. Kapila Against Far East Aviation Group LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Default Judgment Order Fri 05/12 11:31 AM
Order Granting Trustee's Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 14
Thursday, May 11, 2023
14 14 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/11 3:03 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Far East Aviation Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/16 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 04/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Far East Aviation Group, LLC (Re:11 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Far East Aviation Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, April 13, 2023
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/13 9:26 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Far East Aviation Group, LLC Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Far East Aviation Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
11 11 motion Default Wed 04/12 6:12 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Far East Aviation Group, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/07 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,7 Order on Motion to Issue Summons,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,9 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, February 03, 2023
9 9 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 2:12 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 2:08 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Far East Aviation Group, LLC Answer Due 3/6/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01309 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Far East Aviation Group, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
7 7 order Issue Summons Order Fri 02/03 2:06 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons and Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conferenc Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #6
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
6 6 motion Issue Summons Wed 02/01 5:32 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons & Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
5 5 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:19 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 2:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Far East Aviation Group, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01309 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Far East Aviation Group, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 2:13 PM
Adversary case 22-01309 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against FAR EAST AVIATION GROUP, LLC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]