Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01314
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Global Engine Stands, Inc.
Represented By
Global Engine Stands, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 7:55 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1314 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 2:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,13 Default Judgment,14 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. .)
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re:14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. .))
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
15 15 court Notice of PDF Document to BNC Fri 02/10 2:33 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. .)
14 14 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 2:28 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. .
13 13 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 2:27 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 2:25 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #11
Thursday, February 09, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/09 3:28 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Global Engine Stands, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
10 10 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 02/08 3:01 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing - Hearing was set in ERROR. Related [+]
Related: [-] 9 Amended Notice of Hearing (Re: Scheduling Conference Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. **Amended to include NEW Zoom Link.) (Gutierrez, Susan
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
9 9 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Tue 02/07 5:30 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Related [+]
Related: [-] Scheduling Conference Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. **Amended to include NEW Zoom Link. (Gutierrez, Susan
Saturday, January 28, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. (Re:6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:24 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
6 6 motion Default Wed 01/25 4:22 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Global Engine Stands, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 3:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:38 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Global Engine Stands, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01314 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Global Engine Stands, Inc. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 2:25 PM
Adversary case 22-01314 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against GLOBAL ENGINE STANDS, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]