Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01318
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hurley Aviation Services, Inc.
Represented By
Hurley Aviation Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/06 10:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1318 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
17 17 court Notification of Returned Mail Tue 02/28 11:31 AM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Notice of Entry of Judgment, ECF #12) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/21 12:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Default Judgment,12 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
15 15 court Notification of Returned Mail Wed 02/15 9:24 AM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Entry of Default, ECF #7) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 12, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. .)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 3:56 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. .
11 11 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 3:52 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 3:51 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #9
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/08 4:57 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. (Re:6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:28 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
6 6 motion Default Wed 01/25 4:36 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 11:05 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:31 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:31 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Hurley Aviation Services, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01318 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Hurley Aviation Services, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 2:41 PM
Adversary case 22-01318 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Hurley Aviation Services, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]