Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01321
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Informa Media, Inc.
Represented By
Informa Media, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, April 27, 2023
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/27 6:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1321 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/04 1:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Monday, April 03, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/03 3:18 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding - (Settlement). (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/07 3:21 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 2:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,7 Order on Motion to Issue Summons,8 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 9:03 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Informa Media, Inc. Answer Due 3/6/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01321 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Informa Media, Inc. a/k/a Aviation Week a/k/a Aviation Week Network. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, February 02, 2023
7 7 order Issue Summons Order Thu 02/02 2:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #6
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
6 6 motion Issue Summons Tue 01/31 6:20 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 11:13 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:43 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Informa Media, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01321 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Informa Media, Inc. a/k/a Aviation Week a/k/a Aviation Week Network. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:03 PM
Adversary case 22-01321 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Informa Media, Inc. a/k/a Aviation Week a/k/a Aviation Week Network. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/28/2022 (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]