Kapila v. Islander Supply, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01324 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Islander Supply, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/31 8:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1324 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [Settlement]. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Election to Participate in Mediation Filed by Defendant Islander Supply, LLC. (Loren, Bruce) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Bruce E Loren Filed by Defendant Islander Supply, LLC. (Loren, Bruce) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines . (Barr, Ida) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Islander Supply, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Barr, Ida) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01324 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Islander Supply, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) |