Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01326
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vibrant Corporation
Represented By
Vibrant Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, October 21, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/17 8:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1326 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 09/30 4:16 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:25 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Vibrant Corporation Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01326 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against VIBRANT CORPORATION. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:14 PM
Adversary case 22-01326 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against VIBRANT CORPORATION. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]