Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01329
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Willlis Aeronautical Services, Inc
Represented By
Willlis Aeronautical Services, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 10, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, June 30, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/01 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. This Adversary Proceeding is dismissed based upon the settlement between the parties. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 4:50 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. This Adversary Proceeding is dismissed based upon the settlement between the parties. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/22 4:09 PM
Notice of Filing Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/06 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1329 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc .)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc .)
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 9:31 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,13 Default Judgment,15 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Monday, February 13, 2023
16 16 utility Corrective Entry Mon 02/13 9:35 PM
Notice of Corrective Entry To Reflect Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 14 **ENTERED IN ERROR, See ECF #15 for Correct Notice**Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc .) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) Modified on 2/13/2023 .
15 15 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 9:02 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc .
14 14 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 8:59 PM
**ENTERED IN ERROR**Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) Modified on 2/13/2023 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc .
13 13 order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 02/13 8:57 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services Inc . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Order Mon 02/13 8:38 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #11
Thursday, February 09, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/09 5:36 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc (Re:8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 01/26 1:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
8 8 motion Default Wed 01/25 3:19 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Willis Aeronautical Services, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 1:18 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Willlis Aeronautical Services, Inc Answer Due 10/28/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01329 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WILLIS AERONAUTICAL SERVICES, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:56 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 12:55 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Willlis Aeronautical Services, Inc Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01329 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WILLIS AERONAUTICAL SERVICES, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:22 PM
Adversary case 22-01329 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WILLIS AERONAUTICAL SERVICES, INC.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]