Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01331
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Windrow, LLC
Represented By
Windrow, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 27, 2023
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/27 10:20 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1331 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 03/06 2:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/07 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,9 Order on Motion to Issue Summons,10 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued,11 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, February 03, 2023
11 11 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 2:18 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 10 Alias/Pluries Summons Issued
10 10 court Alias/Pluries Summons Issued [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/03 2:18 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Windrow, LLC Answer Due 3/6/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01331 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Windrow, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022**To edit text** .
9 9 order Issue Summons Order Fri 02/03 2:13 PM
Order Granting Motion to Issue Alias Summons and Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #8
Thursday, February 02, 2023
8 8 motion Issue Summons Thu 02/02 4:46 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Issue Alias Summons & Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 10:38 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Windrow, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01331 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WINDROW, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:04 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:03 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Windrow, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01331 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WINDROW, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:25 PM
Adversary case 22-01331 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WINDROW, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]