Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01332
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wishpets, LLC
Represented By
Wishpets, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 8:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1332 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 1:54 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 10:44 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Selection of Mediator Fri 02/03 10:16 AM
Notice of Selection of Roy S Kobert as Mediator Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Mon 01/30 4:26 PM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in the Mediation Process , Filed by Defendant Wishpets, LLC. (Bloom, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 11:04 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
5 5 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Wishpets, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01332 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WISHPETS, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:07 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:06 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Wishpets, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01332 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WISHPETS, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:28 PM
Adversary case 22-01332 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against WISHPETS, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]