Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01334
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Bowthorpe
Represented By
Todd Bowthorpe
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/19 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Sunday, September 17, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Settlement) (Re: # 20 ) (Snipes, Jeanne)
Friday, September 15, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/15 9:46 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Settlement) Related [+] (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] # 20
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
21 21 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 09/13 10:53 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing - Related [+] (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 17 Verified Motion Defendant's Verified Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default and Default Judgment Filed by Defendant Todd Bowthorpe,18 Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing (Re: 17 Verified Motion Defendant's Verified Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default and Default Judgment). Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference Has Been Cancelled. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Tue 08/29 4:43 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 19, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/20 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing (Re: 17 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Defendant Todd Bowthorpe). Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Thursday, August 17, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Thu 08/17 9:01 AM
Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 17 Miscellaneous Motion filed by Defendant Todd Bowthorpe
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 08/16 12:37 PM
Verified Motion Defendant's Verified Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default and Default Judgment Filed by Defendant Todd Bowthorpe (Swinson, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, March 06, 2023
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/06 10:23 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1334 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe .)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe .)
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 9:39 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Default Judgment,12 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Monday, February 13, 2023
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 8:48 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe .
11 11 order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 02/13 8:45 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Mon 02/13 8:40 PM
Order Granting Trustee Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #9
Thursday, February 09, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/09 6:01 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Todd Bowthorpe Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/02 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe (Re:6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Monday, January 30, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 01/30 2:33 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, January 27, 2023
6 6 motion Default Fri 01/27 5:12 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Todd Bowthorpe Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 11:20 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:12 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:11 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Todd Bowthorpe Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01334 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Todd Bowthorpe. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 3:38 PM
Adversary case 22-01334 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Todd Bowthorpe. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]