Kapila v. Integrity Aviation and Leasing, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01337 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Integrity Aviation and Leasing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 01/23 8:11 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1337 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Integrity Aviation and Leasing, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01337 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against INTEGRITY AVIATION AND LEASING, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) |