Kapila v. Twin Manufacturing Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01338 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Twin Manufacturing Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/31 8:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1338 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [Settlement]. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila . (Dillworth, Drew) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Twin Manufacturing Company Answer Due 10/28/2022 Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01338 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against TWIN MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) |