Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01340
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
SAAD Productions, LLC
Represented By
SAAD Productions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/06 10:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1340 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant SAAD Productions LLC .)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Entry (Re:11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant SAAD Productions LLC .)
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 9:42 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Default Judgment,12 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Monday, February 13, 2023
12 12 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 9:22 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 11 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant SAAD Productions LLC .
11 11 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 02/13 9:21 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant SAAD Productions LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Default Judgment Order Mon 02/13 9:09 PM
Order Granting Trustee Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #9
Friday, February 10, 2023
9 9 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/10 12:13 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against SAAD PRODUCTIONS, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 29, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant SAAD Productions, LLC (Re:6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant SAAD Productions, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, January 27, 2023
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 9:36 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant SAAD Productions, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant SAAD Productions, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 26, 2023
6 6 motion Default Thu 01/26 2:22 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant SAAD Productions, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 1:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:39 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on SAAD Productions, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01340 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against SAAD PRODUCTIONS, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 4:28 PM
Adversary case 22-01340 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against SAAD PRODUCTIONS, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]