Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01341
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Feb 13, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, February 13, 2023
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/13 8:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1341 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 01/27 4:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/17 4:51 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Election to Participate in Mediation , Filed by Defendant Standard Aero Holdings, Inc. Related [+]. (Romero, Ezequiel)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED.
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 01/17 4:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Ezequiel Joseph Romero Filed by Defendant Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.. (Romero, Ezequiel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 1:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:43 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Standard Aero Holdings, Inc. Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01341 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 4:42 PM
Adversary case 22-01341 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]