Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01343
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MFG Investments, LLC
Represented By
MFG Investments, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/06 10:55 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1343 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
20 20 court Notification of Returned Mail Tue 03/21 12:23 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Notice of Entry of Default, ECF #13) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/02 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re:8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC (Re:7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila))
Monday, February 27, 2023
18 18 court Notice of PDF Document to BNC Mon 02/27 4:44 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC (Re:7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
17 17 court Notification of Returned Mail Mon 02/27 12:22 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Clerk's Default, ECF #8) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MFG Investments LLC .)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MFG Investments LLC .)
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 9:45 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,12 Default Judgment,13 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Monday, February 13, 2023
13 13 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 9:27 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 12 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MFG Investments LLC .
12 12 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 02/13 9:26 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MFG Investments LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Default Judgment Order Mon 02/13 9:24 PM
Order Granting Trustee Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #10
Friday, February 10, 2023
10 10 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/10 12:33 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 29, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC (Re:7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, January 27, 2023
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 9:39 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 26, 2023
7 7 motion Default Thu 01/26 2:16 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant MFG Investments, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
6 6 misc Amended Document Fri 10/21 1:52 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Corrected Pleading Name Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 1:09 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:49 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 09/28 1:48 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on MFG Investments, LLC Answer Due 10/28/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01343 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MFG Investments, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/27 5:11 PM
Adversary case 22-01343 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against MFG Investments, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]