Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01346
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Aug 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
ODYSSEY LEASING III, LLC
Represented By
ODYSSEY LEASING III, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, September 07, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/07 3:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 14 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/29 12:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1346 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/29 9:03 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/12 1:11 PM
Notice of Filing Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Mediator Wed 07/12 11:01 AM
Report of Mediator Filed by Mediator Jerry Markowitz. (Markowitz, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/01 3:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Extend Time
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 06/01 9:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Jerry M Markowitz Filed by Mediator Jerry Markowitz. (Markowitz, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
9 9 order Extend Time Order Wed 05/31 12:07 PM
Order Granting Agreed Ex-Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation and Extending Other Dates and Deadlines under Procedures Order Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 8
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 motion Extend Time Fri 05/26 1:28 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Complete Mediation and Extending Other Dates and Deadlines under Procedures Order Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Selection of Mediator Tue 01/31 1:38 PM
Notice of Selection of Jerry Markowitz as Mediator Filed by Defendant Odyssey Leasing III, LLC. (Robert, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Tue 01/17 12:38 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Election to Participate in Mediation Process , Filed by Defendant Odyssey Leasing III, LLC Related [+]. (Robert, Seth)
Related: [-] 4 Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED.
Thursday, October 27, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 2:02 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
4 4 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 7:43 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 7:43 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Odyssey Leasing III, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01346 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against ODYSSEY LEASING III, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 11:13 AM
Adversary case 22-01346 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against ODYSSEY LEASING III, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]