Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01349
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
AERONAUTICAL TITLE AND ESCROW SERVICE, LLC
d/b/a Aero Title Bonded and Insured 499 W. Sheridan Ave Ste 2200
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Represented By
AERONAUTICAL TITLE AND ESCROW SERVICE, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, October 20, 2022
8 8 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/17 8:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1349 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01349 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Thursday, September 29, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 09/29 2:16 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 8:10 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 8:10 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01349 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against AERONAUTICAL TITLE AND ESCROW SERVICE, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 11:52 AM
Adversary case 22-01349 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against AERONAUTICAL TITLE AND ESCROW SERVICE, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]