Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01354
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Safran Test Cells
Represented By
Safran Test Cells
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
45 45 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/04 7:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1354 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
44 44 misc Certificate of Service Mon 02/12 10:41 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 43 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, February 09, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/09 10:58 PM
Order of Dismissal (Settlement). (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
42 42 notice Notice of Filing Wed 01/17 11:27 AM
Notice of Filing Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
41 41 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Thu 12/14 1:09 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order. Pretrial Conference set for 05/02/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 40
Monday, December 11, 2023
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Motion Mon 12/11 2:52 PM
Ex Parte Motion for an Order Extedning Dates and Deadlines Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/20 12:44 PM
Notice of Filing Intent to Serve Subpoena , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
38 38 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/09 9:54 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
37 37 notice Notice of Filing Wed 11/08 1:34 PM
Notice of Filing Intent to Serve Subpoena , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
36 36 notice Notice of Filing Mon 10/30 1:21 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Serving Plaintiffs Report on Financial Condition of Debtors and Insolvency , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Extend Time Order Mon 10/30 8:43 AM
Order Granting Second Agreed Ex- Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 03/07/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 34
Friday, October 27, 2023
34 34 motion Extend Time Fri 10/27 3:09 PM
Second Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Filing Wed 10/25 12:13 PM
Notice of Filing Intent to Serve Subpoena , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Motion to Extend Time
31 31 order Extend Time Order Tue 10/10 9:07 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Certain Dates and Deadlines under Procedures Order Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 27
Monday, October 02, 2023
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/02 10:05 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
Friday, September 29, 2023
29 29 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 09/29 5:27 PM
Cross Notice of Taking Deposition of Alan Boyer on October 11, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-]
28 28 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 09/29 12:51 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 27 Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Certain Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila.
27 27 motion Extend Time Fri 09/29 10:23 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Certain Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Silver, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Mon 09/25 4:18 PM
Notice of Filing Intent to Serve Third Party Subpoena , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
25 25 attydoc Notice of Unavailability [Attorney] Tue 09/12 12:01 PM
Notice of Unavailability from September 25, 2023 to October 6, 2023 by Attorney Drew M Dillworth. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
24 24 misc Subpoena Wed 08/23 3:19 PM
Subpoena of Alan Boyer, Unexecuted on 8/30/23, Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
23 23 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 07/31 4:14 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/21 3:13 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice of Serving Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/18 12:56 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Amended Subpoena , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Fri 07/07 3:56 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Subpoena to Alan Boyer , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/29 12:46 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint of Soneet Kapila, Trustee and Request for Jury Demand Filed by Safran Test Cells. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/05 1:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 15 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,17 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Sunday, June 04, 2023
17 17 order Extend Time Order Sun 06/04 4:47 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 16
Friday, June 02, 2023
16 16 motion Extend Time Fri 06/02 12:03 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Dates and Deadlines Under Procedures Order Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/02 11:08 AM
Amended Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Safran Test Cells. Complaint Amended to Update Claims and Exhibits. Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01354 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Safran Test Cells. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text.. filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/31 1:07 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Request for Jury Demand Filed by Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
13 13 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Mon 04/10 4:44 PM
Order Granting Expedited Motion Waive Local Rule 2090(C)(2) Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells - Re: # 12 . (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Motion Mon 04/10 3:48 PM
Expedited Motion Waive Local Rule 2090(C)(2) Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice Order Fri 01/27 12:17 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #10
Thursday, January 26, 2023
10 10 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/26 12:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Roland Gary Jones [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/26 1:03 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 22-01354 RAM] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41992971. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Mon 01/16 11:40 AM
Notice of Filing Election to Participate in Mediation , Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 01/16 11:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Brian K. McMahon Esq. Filed by Defendant Safran Test Cells. (McMahon, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/27 2:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Safran Test Cells Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01354 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Safran Test Cells. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 8:58 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 8:58 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Safran Test Cells Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01354 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Safran Test Cells. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 1:39 PM
Adversary case 22-01354 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Safran Test Cells. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]