Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01358
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc
Represented By
Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc
contact info
Defendant
Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC
Represented By
Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, November 10, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/10 10:16 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 15 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, October 27, 2023
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/27 11:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1358 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/27 11:55 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/22 1:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic)
Thursday, February 16, 2023
13 13 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 02/16 11:31 AM
Order Setting Hearing on Sufficiency of Service Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 12 Notification of Returned Mail
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
12 12 court Notification of Returned Mail Tue 02/14 2:41 PM
Notification of Returned Mail. A document (Clerk's Entry of Default, ECF #10 ) mailed to the party indicated on the attached notice, has been returned to the bankruptcy court due to the inability of the U.S. Postal Service to deliver it as addressed. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 29, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC (Re:8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc. and Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, January 27, 2023
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 9:59 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc. and Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 9:55 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc. and Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 26, 2023
8 8 motion Default Thu 01/26 4:56 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc. and Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/25 5:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022; Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01358 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc., Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:28 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:27 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022; Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01358 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc., Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 3:06 PM
Adversary case 22-01358 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc., Odyssey Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]