Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01359
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Terminated:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Xtreme Aviation, LLC
Represented By
Xtreme Aviation, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, July 17, 2023
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/17 8:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1359 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 13 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/28 10:34 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Selection of Mediator Fri 02/03 10:01 AM
Notice of Selection of Roy S Kobert as Mediator Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 4:57 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
10 10 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Sun 10/02 8:38 PM
Notice of Filing Objection to Entry of Final Orders and Judgments by Bankruptcy Court , Filed by Defendant Xtreme Aviation, LLC Related [+]. (Breslin, Jerrell)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Sun 10/02 8:35 PM
Notice of Filing Consent to Jury Trial Before Bankruptcy Judge , Filed by Defendant Xtreme Aviation, LLC Related [+]. (Breslin, Jerrell)
Related: [-] 7 Jury Demand Filed by Defendant Xtreme Aviation, LLC (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). filed by Defendant Xtreme Aviation, LLC
7 7 misc Jury Demand Sun 10/02 8:30 PM
Jury Demand Filed by Defendant Xtreme Aviation, LLC Related [+]. (Breslin, Jerrell)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 10/02 8:26 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Adversary Complaint and Request for Jury Demand Filed by Xtreme Aviation, LLC. (Breslin, Jerrell)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Xtreme Aviation, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01359 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Xtreme Aviation, LLC Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Thursday, September 29, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:32 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:31 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Xtreme Aviation, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01359 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Xtreme Aviation, LLC Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. . filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 3:44 PM
Adversary case 22-01359 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Xtreme Aviation, LLC Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 9/29/2022 to Edit Text. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]