Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01360
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2022
Dismissed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders
Represented By
Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, October 17, 2022
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/17 8:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1360 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01360 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/02 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Thursday, September 29, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 09/29 1:46 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:36 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Thu 09/29 9:35 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01360 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/28 4:17 PM
Adversary case 22-01360 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths Tubular Systems a/k/a Lewis & Saunders. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]