Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01362
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rolf Coppenrath
Provo Invest, Inc. 4585 N. Meridian Ave.
Miami Beach, FL 33140
Represented By
Rolf Coppenrath
contact info
Defendant
Silvia Regina Bitaraes
Represented By
Silvia Regina Bitaraes
contact info
Defendant
David Alan Boyer
3135 Sheridan Ave
Miami, FL 33140
Represented By
David Alan Boyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
35 35 court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/12 8:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1362 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/11 10:15 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Thursday, March 07, 2024
33 33 order Dismiss Party Order Thu 03/07 8:50 AM
Order Granting Renewed Motion to Dismiss Remaining Claims Against Alan Boyer. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 30
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/10 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 31 Notice of Hearing
31 31 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 01/10 6:48 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Alan Boyer/Motion To Dismiss Remaining Claims Against Alan Boyer Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila.
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
30 30 4 pgs motion Dismiss Party Tue 01/09 2:58 PM
Renewed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Alan Boyer / Motion To Dismiss Remaining Claims Against Alan Boyer Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew) Modified on 1/10/2024**To edit text** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 2:28 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Friday, July 07, 2023
28 28 order Dismiss Party Order Fri 07/07 8:04 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Party Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] # 25
Monday, June 05, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/05 3:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Hearing
Friday, June 02, 2023
26 26 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 06/02 9:03 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 25 Motion to Dismiss Alan Boyer/Remaining Claims Against Alan Boyer Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila.
Thursday, June 01, 2023
25 25 4 pgs motion Dismiss Party Thu 06/01 3:02 PM
Motion to Dismiss Alan Boyer/ Remaining Claims Against Alan Boyer Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
24 24 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Mon 05/08 6:19 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements /Rule 26(A)(2) Expert Disclosures Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
23 23 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Mon 05/01 11:45 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 07/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, February 24, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/24 9:18 AM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Request for Jury Demand Filed by David Alan Boyer . (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/23 7:47 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Silvia Regina Bitaraes. (Aresty, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Fri 02/17 5:56 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Serving First Set Of Interrogatories, Expert Witness Interrogatories, First Request For Production, And First Request For Admissions To Defendant Bitaraes , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 02/17 5:42 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/14 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Monday, February 13, 2023
17 17 order Dismiss Party Order Mon 02/13 9:32 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss of Silvia Regina Bitaras and Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/06/2023 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #14
Thursday, February 02, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Thu 02/02 4:14 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice of Partial Settlement as to Defendant, Rolf Coppenrath Only , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
15 15 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 01/17 6:58 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 11:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Silvia Regina Bitaras Filed by Defendant Silvia Regina Bitaraes.
Monday, January 16, 2023
14 14 motion Dismiss Party Mon 01/16 1:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Defendant Silvia Regina Bitaras Filed by Defendant Silvia Regina Bitaraes (Aresty, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 02, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Mon 01/02 8:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Joel M. Aresty Esq. Filed by Defendant Silvia Regina Bitaraes. (Aresty, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Filing Mon 12/05 2:40 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Election to Participate in Mediation Process , Filed by Defendant Rolf Coppenrath. (Riedi, Claudio)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/07 4:08 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Rolf Coppenrath. (Riedi, Claudio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Filing Thu 11/03 3:21 PM
Notice of Filing Return of Service , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01362 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Rolf Coppenrath, Silvia Regina Bitaraes, David Alan Boyer. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Silvia Regina Bitaraes Answer Due 10/31/2022; David Alan Boyer Answer Due 10/31/2022; Rolf Coppenrath Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01362 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Rolf Coppenrath, Silvia Regina Bitaraes, David Alan Boyer. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).,6 Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED.
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address (Attorney) Wed 11/02 2:02 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Claudio Riedi, Esq. Filed by Defendant Rolf Coppenrath. (Riedi, Claudio)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 11/02 1:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Claudio Riedi Filed by Defendant Rolf Coppenrath. (Riedi, Claudio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/25 3:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Silvia Regina Bitaraes Answer Due 10/31/2022; David Alan Boyer Answer Due 10/31/2022; Rolf Coppenrath Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01362 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Rolf Coppenrath, Silvia Regina Bitaraes, David Alan Boyer. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:18 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:17 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Silvia Regina Bitaraes Answer Due 10/31/2022; David Alan Boyer Answer Due 10/31/2022; Rolf Coppenrath Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01362 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Rolf Coppenrath, Silvia Regina Bitaraes, David Alan Boyer. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 10:41 AM
Adversary case 22-01362 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Rolf Coppenrath, Silvia Regina Bitaraes, David Alan Boyer. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]