Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01366
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC
1209 Orange St.
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, August 10, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/10 11:16 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 23 Order (Generic)
Monday, August 07, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 08/07 9:46 AM
Agreed Order Granting Joint Motion to Vacate Final Judgment and Dismiss Action With Prejudice Re: Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 13 Default Judgment
Friday, August 04, 2023
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/04 1:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 20 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, August 03, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 08/03 11:18 AM
Joint Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/02 11:36 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 8:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1366 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,13 Default Judgment,14 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Sunday, February 12, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MONROE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ADVISORS, LLC .)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MONROE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ADVISORS, LLC .
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/13 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Entry (Re:13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MONROE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ADVISORS, LLC .)
Friday, February 10, 2023
14 14 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Fri 02/10 5:22 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 13 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MONROE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ADVISORS, LLC .
13 13 order Default Judgment [Order] Fri 02/10 5:09 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant MONROE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT ADVISORS, LLC . (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Order Fri 02/10 5:04 PM
Order Granting Verified Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #11
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
11 11 motion Default Judgment Tue 02/07 3:03 PM
Verified Motion for Default Judgment Against Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 29, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC (Re:8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, January 27, 2023
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 10:01 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 8 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 26, 2023
8 8 motion Default Thu 01/26 5:06 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01366 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:40 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:39 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01366 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 1:03 PM
Adversary case 22-01366 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]