Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01367
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/31 8:44 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1367 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/17 5:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 9 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/15 11:38 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding [Settlement]. . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Tue 03/07 3:26 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee Kapilas Notice Of Settlement , Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/21 2:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Thursday, October 20, 2022
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc. Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01367 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:49 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:48 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc. Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01367 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 1:47 PM
Adversary case 22-01367 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]