Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-ap-01369
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2022
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Avocet Aviation Services, LLC
Represented By
Avocet Aviation Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
150 West Flagler Street #2200
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Drew M Dillworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/06 10:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-1369 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Entry (Re:17 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services LLC .)
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/17 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice of Entry (Re:17 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services LLC .)
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 9:08 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,17 Default Judgment,18 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Monday, February 13, 2023
18 18 court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 02/13 9:15 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 17 Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services LLC .
17 17 2 pgs order Default Judgment [Order] Mon 02/13 9:14 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services LLC . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Default Judgment Order Mon 02/13 9:12 PM
Order Granting Trustee Verified Ex Parte Motion For Entry of Final Default Judgment Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] #15
Friday, February 10, 2023
15 15 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/10 2:01 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 29, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/30 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services, LLC (Re:12 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila)
Friday, January 27, 2023
13 13 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 01/27 10:05 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 12 Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, January 26, 2023
12 12 motion Default Thu 01/26 4:00 PM
Verified Motion for Default Against Defendant Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
11 11 misc Amended Document Wed 10/26 2:58 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Complete Zip Code Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Document filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
10 10 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Tue 10/25 11:05 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. Incomplete Zip code for defendant's address. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE OR FILE AN AMENDED DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Document To Reflect Correct Document Description Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:7 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Monday, October 24, 2022
9 9 misc Amended Document Mon 10/24 5:44 PM
Amended Document To Reflect Correct Document Description Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 7 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Friday, October 21, 2022
8 8 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Fri 10/21 3:17 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. Incorrect defendant listed for complaint served on "Financial Pacific Leasing Inc." THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE OR FILE AN AMENDED DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 7 Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila (Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines). filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, October 20, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 5:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
6 6 13 pgs order Order (Generic) [PAPERLESS] Thu 10/20 3:04 PM
Amended Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Trustee Kapila Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines entered in each Avoidance Action is VACATED. The scheduling conference scheduled for December 8, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 (Re:1 Adversary case 22-01369 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Avocet Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila) Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference.
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/03 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re:2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference).
Friday, September 30, 2022
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:58 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 09/30 9:56 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Avocet Aviation Services, LLC Answer Due 10/31/2022 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/08/2022 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-01369 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Avocet Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Thursday, September 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/29 2:35 PM
Adversary case 22-01369 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Avocet Aviation Services, LLC. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]