California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:22-bk-15409
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Nov 10, 2022

Debtor
FC Construction Services, Inc.
7345 W Avenue A8
Lancaster, CA 93536-8434
Represented By
Steven A Alpert
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John P Pringle (TR)
Roquemore, Pringle & Moore, Inc. 6055 East Washington Blvd., Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90040
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 10/04/2022 12:03 AM PDT
Monday, October 03, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 10/03 8:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:22-bk-15409] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54728810. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 120 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 10/03 8:25 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by FC Construction Services, Inc. (Alpert, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Mon 10/03 8:31 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor FC Construction Services, Inc.. (Alpert, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Mon 10/03 8:35 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/10/2022 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]