Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-15409

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:22-ap-01203
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2022
Terminated:Feb 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
FC Construction Services, Inc.
7345 West Ave A-8
Lancaster, CA 93536
Represented By
FC Construction Services, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Chad Adams
Represented By
Chad Adams
contact info
Plaintiff
Steve Martinez
Represented By
Marcus Gomez
Law Office Of Marcus Gomez
contact info
Trustee
John P Pringle (TR)
Roquemore, Pringle & Moore, Inc. 6055 East Washington Blvd., Suite 500
Los Angeles, CA 90040
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, February 24, 2023
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/24 11:18 AM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-1203 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (ME2)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/27 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
4 4 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Wed 01/25 7:11 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this Adversary No.: 2:22-ap-01203-BB is dismissed without prejudice; Signed on 1/25/2023 Related [+]. (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Martinez
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
6 6 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 01/30 2:39 PM
Hearing Held on 1-24-23 re1 Status Conference re: 65 (Dischargeability - other) Steve Martinez against FC Construction Services, Inc., Chad Adams: RULING - Tentative is the ruling. Court will prepare order dismissing w/o prejudice; (ME2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 11/29 8:40 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK:2:22-ap-01203-BB] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54903415. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 11/23 10:05 AM
Summons Issued on Chad Adams Date Issued 11/23/2022, Answer Due 12/23/2022; FC Construction Services, Inc. Date Issued 11/23/2022, Answer Due 12/23/2022 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (ME2)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steve Martinez
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
2 2 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Tue 11/22 2:13 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff Steve Martinez. (Gomez, Marcus)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/22 2:11 PM
Adversary case 2:22-ap-01203. Complaint by Steve Martinez against FC Construction Services, Inc., Chad Adams. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Gomez, Marcus)
Related: [-]