Original Case: 9:21-cv-00138

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.pr-02056
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2022
Last checked: Friday Oct 07, 2022 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
SEA PINES RESORT LLC
Defendant
ASSOCIATION OF SEA PINES PLANTATION PROPERTY OWNERS AND THE ADVISORY BOARD
Defendant - Appellant
COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATES INC.
Represented By
William Shawn Bingham
FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP
contact info
Benjamin E. Nicholson
BURR & FORMAN, LLP
contact info
Glenn Wade Leach III
BURR & FORMAN, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JILL K. JINKS, individually and as Trustee of the Jinks Heritage Trust
Represented By
Ainsley Fisher Tillman
FORD WALLACE THOMSON LLC
contact info
Ian Scott Ford
FORD WALLACE THOMSON LLC
contact info
Steven James Flynn
LOCKE LORD LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/07/2022 4:21 AM EDT
Thursday, October 06, 2022
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:21-cv-00138-DCN. Case manager: KHancock. [1001243646] 22-2056 KH [Entered: 10/06/2022 03:46 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 9:21-cv-00138-DCN. Mailed to: William Shawn Bingham, Steven James Flynn. [1001243657] 22-2056 KH [Entered: 10/06/2022 03:54 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 22-2056 with 22-2013 Cross-appeal appellant: Jill Jinks. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: William Shawn Bingham, Nicholas Clarence Chapma Stewart, Steven James Flynn. [1001243666] 22-2013 22-2056 KH [Entered: 10/06/2022 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]