District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amy Berman Jackson
Case #: 1:22-cv-03062
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2022
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2023 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By
John Moustakas
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON
Represented By
C. Peter Sorenson
Sorenson Law Office
contact info

GPO Feb 18 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/18/2025. (lcabj2)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 1:30 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5147 for24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/22 10:40 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 04/21 9:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-11633069. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 19 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 02/18 11:26 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/18/2025. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 02/18 11:25 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 and 58 and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment [Dkt. # 15] is GRANTED and plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment [Dkt. # 17] is DENIED. This case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/18/2025. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 06/07 12:39 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON. (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
20 20 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 04/30 11:58 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re17 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (See docket entry19 to view document) (zdp)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 04/26 1:51 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
order Order on Motion to Modify Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/09 2:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting18 Motion to Modify Summary Judgment Schedule. Defendant's reply/cross-opposition is due by April 26, 2024. Plaintiff's cross-reply is due by June 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/2024. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/09 4:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/26/2024. (zkh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
18 18 motion Modify Mon 04/08 5:02 PM
Consent MOTION to Modify Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Thu 03/21 1:16 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON.(Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Wilson 2d,
Att: 3 Declaration Coffindaffer,
Att: 4 Statement of Facts,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
16 16 2 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 03/21 1:13 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON.(Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Wilson 2d,
Att: 3 Declaration Coffindaffer,
Att: 4 Statement of Facts,
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
Thursday, February 22, 2024
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Thu 02/22 6:43 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts Defendant's Statement of Material Facts Not in Genuine Dispute,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Michael G. Seidel,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Seidel Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration Second Declaration of Michael G. Seidel
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/14 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion. Defendant must file its motion for summary judgment by February 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2024. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Mon 02/12 5:53 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 01/09 9:59 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION Substituting for attorney John Moustakas (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/21 1:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that defendant must file a motion for summary judgment by February 19, 2024; plaintiff must file an opposition, combined with a cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, in a single memorandum of points and authorities, by March 21, 2024; defendant must file a reply and cross-opposition, if any, in a single memorandum of points and authorities, by April 11, 2024; and plaintiff must file a cross-reply, if any, by April 25, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/21/2023. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 12/20 11:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Moustakas, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/18 7:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the11 joint status report, it is ORDERED that defendant must file a motion for summary judgment by December 20, 2023; plaintiff must file an opposition, combined with a cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, in a single memorandum of points and authorities, by January 31, 2024; defendant must file a reply and cross-opposition, if any, in a single memorandum of points and authorities, by February 28, 2024; and plaintiff must file a cross-reply, if any, by March 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/18/2023. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
11 11 misc Status Report Thu 09/14 5:39 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON. (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 06/05 9:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the10 joint status report, the parties must submit a joint status report by September 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/05/2023. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 06/01 2:55 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON. (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/07 10:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's9 status report, the parties must submit a joint status report by June 1, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/07/2023. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 02/02 5:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Moustakas, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
8 8 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/03 2:43 PM
ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before January 31, 2023. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/03/2023. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/27 11:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Moustakas, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Thu 12/08 5:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2022. (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
notice Notice of QC Wed 12/07 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to petesorenson@gmail.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please note the following deficiency and file/refile document as instructed , 2. Please refile return of service for U.S. Attorney. (zjm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/29 5:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 27, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/2022. (lcabj2)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Mon 11/28 8:29 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/17/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/25/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/25/2022.) (Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/28 3:35 AM
NOTICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Moustakas, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Document Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/25 11:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Moustakas, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 10/11 3:49 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/11 3:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 08, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 10/08 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9586694) filed by JOHN CHRISTIAN WILSON.(Sorenson, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to FBI,
Att: 3 Summons to USAG,
Att: 4 Summons to USAO-DC,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4,
Att: 9 Exhibit 5,
Att: 10 Exhibit 6