Original Case: 1:22-cv-03062

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05147
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Christian Wilson
Represented By
C. Peter Sorenson
Sorenson Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 5:14 AM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5147
Related: [-]
25 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112778] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-03062-ABJ filed by John Christian Wilson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5147 25-5147
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112780] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/09/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/09/2025 25-5147
Related: [-]