Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:22-cv-02701
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 11, 2023 4:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Christopher Bowden
Defendant
Jeff Coons
Defendant
Memphis Mental Health Institute
Defendant
Michael Rogers
Plaintiff
Frelandra S. Womack
590 Washington Ave
Memphis, TN 38105

GPO Aug 04 2023
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/4/2023. (jdgc)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
37 37 misc Letter Fri 01/24 9:05 AM
Letter from Frelandra Womack requestin copies. (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Monday, August 26, 2024
36 36 misc Letter Tue 08/27 9:57 AM
Letter from Frelandra Womack requesting copies (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
35 35 appeal USCA Order Tue 08/06 1:21 PM
ORDER of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Frelandra S. Womack. ORDER filed to dismiss for want of prosecution for failure to pay fee. No mandate to issue. (jae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Thu 07/18 1:01 PM
Letter from Frelandra Womack requesting copies of all orders from 10/24/23 through 7/12/2024. (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
33 33 appeal USCA Order Tue 06/25 12:58 PM
ORDER of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Frelandra S. Womack. ORDER filed Womacks motion for leave to proceed IFP (COA ECF No. 5 ) and her remaining motions (COA ECF Nos.12 12 11 ) are therefore DENIED. Unless Womack pays the $505 appellate filing fee to the district court within 30 days of the entry of this order, this appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution. COA case number 23-5797 (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 06/05 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address and request for updated docket sheet by Frelandra S. Womack(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Monday, June 03, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 06/04 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Frelandra S. Womack(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Friday, May 10, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/10 1:26 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 05/10/2024. (ach)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 05/06 1:32 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants brief and appointment of counsel by Frelandra S. Womack.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Monday, March 04, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/06 9:08 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Frelandra S. Womack. (jae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
27 27 motion Extend Deadline Wed 01/03 12:12 PM
MOTION for extension of time to seek legal assistance by Frelandra S. Womack.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Thursday, November 09, 2023
26 26 appeal USCA Order Thu 11/09 8:06 AM
ORDER of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Frelandra S. Womack. ORDER filed The show-cause order is WITHDRAWN. (csf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/01 2:17 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/1/2023. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
24 24 appeal USCA Order Tue 10/24 2:39 PM
COA ORDER filed :. This case is REMANDED to the district court for consideration of whether Womacks time for filing a notice of appeal should be extended. While on limited remand, Womacks appeal is held in abeyance. Upon ruling, the district court shall return the case to this court for further proceedings as may be appropriate. COA case number 23-5797 (csf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/02 10:52 AM
PRO SE MOTION "for cause of action" by Frelandra S. Womack. (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/12 8:10 AM
NOTICE of filing transcript order by Frelandra S. Womack re19 Notice of Appeal (jae)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
21 21 appeal USCA Order Fri 09/08 9:16 AM
COA SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Ms. Frelandra S. Womack show cause for possible jurisdictional defect involving the filing of a late notice of appeal. Response due by 09/29/2023 for Frelandra S. Womack. (csf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
20 20 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 09/06 3:04 PM
USCA Case Number 23-5797 for19 Notice of Appeal filed by Frelandra S. Womack. Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Frelandra S. Womack. Transcript needed: n. (csf)
Related: [-]
19 19 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 09/06 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from the Order Adopting Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 17) Judgment (ECF No. 18) ordered in this action on 8/4/2023 by Frelandra S. Womack. (csf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
18 18 order Judgment Fri 08/04 4:34 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 08/04/2023. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
17 17 10 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 08/04 3:47 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 8/4/2023. (jdgc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
16 16 motion Recusal Tue 08/01 2:31 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Recusal of Magistrate Judge Charmiane Claxton by Frelandra S. Womack. (mlk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
15 15 motion Withdraw Mon 07/31 12:51 PM
MOTION (SUBMITTED AS "LETTER TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT") to Withdraw1 Pro Se Complaint by Frelandra S. Womack. (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
14 14 discov Response to Discovery Request Mon 05/22 3:54 PM
Pro Se Admissions and Denials by the Defendant, Frelandra S. Womack.(mlk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/17 10:58 AM
NOTICE of filing police report of crimes against persons since sexual assault report made on 9/1/2022 by Frelandra S. Womack (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/15 1:26 PM
NOTICE: Claim for Relief by Frelandra S. Womack (csf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
11 11 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 04/24 7:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Frelandra S. Womack,7 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Frelandra S. Womack. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 4/24/2023. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/24 1:43 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 4/24/2023. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
9 9 discov Request for Production of Documents Tue 04/18 12:50 PM
REQUEST for Discovery by Frelandra S. Womack.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
8 8 misc Letter Tue 04/18 12:49 PM
Letter from Frelandra Womack addressed to Judge Claxton (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Thursday, January 19, 2023
7 7 motion Default Judgment Fri 01/20 2:14 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Frelandra S. Womack. (agj)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/24 2:11 PM
NOTICE of filing by Frelandra S. Womack(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 police report
Friday, October 14, 2022
misc Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/14 8:52 AM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
5 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/13 12:46 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frelandra S. Womack. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Thu 10/13 12:45 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Christopher Bowden, Jeff Coons, Memphis Mental Health Institute, Michael Rogers, filed by Frelandra S. Womack.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 agreement to receive NEFs,
Att: 2 Judicial Assignment cards
notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 10/13 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
notice ADR Compliance Thu 10/13 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 10/13 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]