Original Case: 2:22-cv-02701

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-05797
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2023
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 5:11 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MEMPHIS MENTAL HEALTH INSTITUTE
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL ROGERS, In official capacity of Legal board of Memphis Mental Health Institute
Defendant - Appellee
JEFF COONS, in his official capacity
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER BOWDEN, in his official capacity
Plaintiff - Appellant
FRELANDRA S. WOMACK
Represented By
Frelandra S. Womack
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/09/2024 5:11 AM CDT
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
The case manager for this case is: Michelle R. Lambert (MRL)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Frelandra S. Womack. Transcript needed: n. (MRL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
Att: 2 7 pgs form(s) sent