Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:22-cv-01225
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2022
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 16, 2023 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Nicolet National Bank
Represented By
George Burnett
Law Firm Of Conway Olejniczak & Jerry Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
GreenStone Farm Credit Services FLCA
3515 West Road
East Lansing, MI 48823
Represented By
Ted A Warpinski
Halling & Cayo Sc
contact info
M Andrew Skwierawski
Amundsen Davis Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
68 68 misc Transcript Wed 12/18 8:55 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference re Motions held on April 10, 2024 before Judge William C. Griesbach Court Reporter/Transcriber Jennifer Stake, Contact at 414-290-2640. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found[LINK:on our website] or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website[LINK:www.wied.uscourts.gov] Redaction Statement due 1/13/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2025. (Stake, Jennifer)
Related: [-]