Original Case: 1:22-cv-01225

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03141
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 27, 2024 3:43 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
NICOLET NATIONAL BANK
Represented By
George Burnett
LAW FIRM OF CONWAY, OLEJNICZAK & JERRY, S.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GREENSTONE FARM CREDIT SERVICES, FLCA
Represented By
M. Andrew Skwierawski
HALLING & CAYO, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/27/2024 2:16 AM CST
Monday, November 25, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/09/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/06/2025 for GreenStone Farm Credit Services, FLCA. [1] [7419858] 24-3141 (JMB) [Entered: 11/25/2024 11:21 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 2 pgs ORDER: Circuit Rule 3(c)(1), referencing Circuit Rule 28(a), requires an appellant to file a docketing statement that provides information concerning the district court?s jurisdiction. If jurisdiction depends on diversity, the statement must identify the jurisdictional amount and the citizenship of each party to the litigation. If any party is a corporation, the rule specifically requires an appellant to identify both the state of incorporation and the state in which the corporation has its principal place of business. And if any party is an unincorporated association or partnership, the statement must identify the citizenship of all members. The statement shall supply similar details concerning the invocation of supplemental jurisdiction or other sources of jurisdiction. In the present case, appellant relies on diversity of citizenship for federal jurisdiction. But appellant?s Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement fails to provide sufficient information about the citizenship of the parties. To the extent GreenStone Farm Credit Services, FLCA, is a corporation, appellant fails to identify the state in which it is incorporated, and to the extent it is an unincorporated association, appellant fails to provide any information about its membership. A specialized statute governs the citizenship of farm credit institutions, see 12 U.S.C. § 2258, but appellant does not identify this statute, assert that Greenstone is an ?institution of the System? within the meaning of that section, or assert explicitly where Greenstone?s ?principal office? is located within the meaning of that section. Another specialized statute governs the citizenship of national banks, see 28 U.S.C. § 1348, but appellant does not identify this statute or assert where Nicolet National Bank is ?located? within the meaning of that section. A National Bank is located in the state designated in its articles of incorporation, which is often, but not necessarily, the state in which it has its principal place of business. See Wachovia Bank v. Schmidt, 546 U.S. 303, 307, 317 n.9 (2006). Accordingly, appellant shall file an amended docketing statement that provides a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before December 2, 2024. JXK [2] [7420019] 24-3141 (AD) [Entered: 11/25/2024 04:20 PM]
Related: [-]