Member Case
Lead case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:22-bk-14068
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Saturday, March 15, 2025
73 73 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/15 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 03/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 71 Final Decree
72 72 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge Sat 03/15 10:15 PM
Courts Notice and BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order of Discharge Related [+]. No. of Notices: 83. Notice Date 03/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 70 Order Discharging Debtor
Thursday, March 13, 2025
71 71 order Final Decree (Chapter 11) Thu 03/13 10:40 AM
Final Decree Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 66 Chapter 11 Final Report and Application for Final Decree
70 70 order Discharge Thu 03/13 10:14 AM
Order Discharging Debtor . (mmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
69 69 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Mon 03/10 12:29 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Shiloh Staedler Churchill Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 66 Chapter 11 Final Report and Application for Final Decree