Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:22-bk-12744
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Plan Confirmed:May 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
MountainSky Landscaping LLC
4467 Clay St
Boulder, CO 80301-3008
Represented By
Aaron J. Conrardy
contact info
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
640 640 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 45. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 639 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
639 639 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 05/06 2:44 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Counsel. Sean D. Raible; Kia Marisa Miller and Bailey C. Pompea Terminated. Related [+]. (ccr)
Related: [-] 620 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Monday, May 05, 2025
638 638 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Mon 05/05 2:54 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Kali Marae Cain on behalf of Gregory P Jones Related [+]. (Cain, Kali)
Related: [-] 620 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,621 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney